Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Sylvain Robin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Blois, France

Titular Bishop of Arneae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1897Born
17 Dec 192124.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Nov 194548.6AppointedBishop of Blois, France
18 Jan 194648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
28 Nov 196164.6ResignedBishop of Blois, France
28 Nov 196164.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arneae
2 Dec 196366.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Sylvain Robin
Bishop Louis-Sylvain Robin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Blois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmboise

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast