Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Nyarko Yeboah

Bishop of Techiman, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1953 Born
21 Jul 199036.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sunyani, Ghana
28 Dec 200754.0AppointedBishop of Techiman, Ghana
29 Mar 200854.2Ordained BishopBishop of Techiman, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Dominic Nyarko Yeboah
Bishop Dominic Nyarko Yeboah (born ) Bishop of Techiman

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNsuta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Techiman.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast