Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis Kweku Essien

Bishop of Wiawso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1945 BornApowa
10 Jul 197731.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
22 Dec 199954.1AppointedBishop of Wiawso, Ghana
25 Mar 200054.3Ordained BishopBishop of Wiawso, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Kweku Essien:
Bishop Joseph Francis Kweku Essien (born ) Bishop of Wiawso

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wiawso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,724

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013