Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Kuuia Baawobr, M. Afr.

Bishop of Wa, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1959 Born
5 Dec 198627.4ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
18 Jul 198728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
31 May 201050.9AppointedSuperior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
17 Feb 201656.6AppointedBishop of Wa, Ghana
7 May 201656.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wa, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Richard Kuuia Baawobr
Bishop Richard Kuuia Baawobr M. Afr. (born ) Bishop of Wa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTom-Zendagangn

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 27 Feb 2016
  • c2: CB, 5 May 2016
  • c3+: CB, 7 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,906

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast