Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicodème Anani Barrigah-Benissan

Archbishop of Lomé, Togo

Apostolic Administrator of Atakpamé


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1963 Born
8 Aug 198724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lomé, Togo
9 Jan 200844.6AppointedBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
9 Mar 200844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Atakpamé, Togo
23 Nov 201956.5AppointedArchbishop of Lomé, Togo
23 Nov 201956.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Atakpamé, Togo
11 Jan 202056.6InstalledArchbishop of Lomé, Togo

MicroData Summary for Nicodème Anani Barrigah-Benissan (VIAF: 36186056)
Archbishop Nicodème Anani Barrigah-Benissan (born ) Archbishop of Lomé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOuagadougou, Burkina Faso
Ordained PriestSainte Trinité, Cathedral, Atakpamé, Diocese of Atakpamé
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Notre-Dame de la Trinité, Cathedral, Atakpamé, Diocese of Atakpamé

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lomé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,690
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2019
  • ab: CB, 23 Nov 2019
  • i: CB, 11 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast