Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Bonaventure Kwofie, C.S.Sp.

Archbishop of Accra, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1958 Born
2 Aug 198729.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
23 Jul 198830.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
3 Jul 201456.1AppointedBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
13 Sep 201456.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sekondi-Takoradi, Ghana
2 Jan 201960.6AppointedArchbishop of Accra, Ghana
1 Mar 201960.8InstalledArchbishop of Accra, Ghana

MicroData Summary for John Bonaventure Kwofie
Archbishop John Bonaventure Kwofie C.S.Sp. (born ) Archbishop of Accra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceApowa
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Our Lady Star of the Sea, Cathedral, Takoradi, Diocese of Sekondi-Takoradi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Accra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2014
  • bp: CB, 4 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 31 Jul 2014
  • c2+: CB, 13 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,285
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2019
  • i: AM, 23 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 24 Feb 2019

Quantcast