Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Kwasi Sarpong

Archbishop Emeritus of Kumasi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1933 BornMaase-Offinso
11 Dec 195926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kumasi, Ghana
20 Nov 196936.7AppointedBishop of Kumasi, Ghana
8 Mar 197037.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kumasi, Ghana
17 Jan 200268.9AppointedArchbishop of Kumasi, Ghana
26 Mar 200875.1RetiredArchbishop of Kumasi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Peter Kwasi Sarpong:
Archbishop Peter Kwasi Sarpong (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kumasi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kumasi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 23 Nov 2014