Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Peter Poreku Cardinal Dery

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Tamale

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1918BornKo
11 Feb 195132.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wa, Ghana
16 Mar 196041.8AppointedBishop of Wa, Ghana
8 May 196042.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wa, Ghana
18 Nov 197456.5AppointedBishop of Tamale, Ghana
30 May 197759.1AppointedArchbishop of Tamale, Ghana
26 Mar 199475.9RetiredArchbishop of Tamale, Ghana
24 Mar 200687.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200687.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina
28 Mar 200687.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina
6 Mar 200889.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Tamale, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Peter Poreku Dery:
Cardinal Peter Poreku Dery (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tamale

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 47.8 years
  • a cardinal for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 44
  • op: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2008, Page 47*
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 12 Oct 2013