Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Accra

Archidioecesis AccraŽnsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 6 July 1992
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ghana
  • Square Kilometers: 3,255 (1,257 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.accracatholic.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box GP 247, Accra, Ghana
  • Telephone: (030)22.22.728
  • Fax: 22.31.619

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Accra
2 December 1943ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Costa d’Oro {Gold Coast} Prefecture Apostolic of Accra (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Accra
12 June 1947ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Accra Vicariate Apostolic of Accra
Diocese of Accra
18 April 1950ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Accra Diocese of Accra
6 July 1992Territory LostDiocese of Accra Diocese of Koforidua (erected)
Archdiocese of Accra
6 July 1992ElevatedDiocese of Accra Archdiocese of Accra

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Accra
195031,4451,311,4642.4%33639806823ap1951
195755,531449531,0478435ap1960
1970125,1001,347,7649.3%181821,5251158722ap1971
1980180,0002,240,0008.0%1465792,27811010924ap1981
1990334,8333,261,00010.3%51701212,7679513641ap1991
Archdiocese of Accra
1999129,8263,870,0003.4%5033831,564536227ap2000
2000130,0003,100,0004.2%5929881,477495225ap2001
2001131,5003,906,5003.4%4731781,685496628ap2002
2002132,0352,909,6434.5%6038981,347596830ap2003
2003139,0003,112,5004.5%62431051,323678032ap2004
2004142,5433,527,4274.0%65421071,332697335ap2005
2005151,7283,604,0004.2%67441111,366747842ap2006
2006180,4323,683,0004.9%74421161,555758851ap2007
2011197,0544,164,0004.7%88651531,2871048823ap2012
2012201,0004,258,0004.7%82661481,3581373624ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013