Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Edwin Herzig

Deceased

Bishop of Tyler, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1929BornSan Antonio
31 May 195525.8Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 198657.3AppointedBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA
24 Feb 198757.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA
7 Sep 199162.1DiedBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Edwin Herzig:
Bishop Charles Edwin Herzig (born , died ) Bishop of Tyler

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013