Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gregory Kelly

Auxiliary Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Jamestown


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1956 Born
15 May 198226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
16 Dec 201559.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dallas, Texas, USA
16 Dec 201559.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Jamestown
11 Feb 201659.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Jamestown

MicroData Summary for John Gregory Kelly
Bishop John Gregory Kelly (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Dallas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeMars, IA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dallas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Dec 2015
  • c34: CB, 26 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018