Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Milner Coerver

Bishop of Lubbock, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1954 Born
27 Jun 198026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
27 Sep 201662.3AppointedBishop of Lubbock, Texas, USA
21 Nov 201662.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lubbock, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Milner Coerver
Bishop Robert Milner Coerver (born ) Bishop of Lubbock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDallas, Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth, Texas
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Lubbock, Diocese of Lubbock, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lubbock.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 27 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,213

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast