Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Amarillo

Dioecesis Amarillensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Patrick James Zurek, Bishop
  • John Walter Yanta, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3 August 1926
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of San Antonio
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Texas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 67,185 (25,800 Square Miles)
  • Description: Childress, Hall, Brisco, Swisher, Castro, Parmer, and ... Counties.
  • Conference Region: X (AR, OK, TX)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: AMA
  • Official Web Site: http://www.amarillodiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 1800 N. Spring St., Amarillo, TX 79107; P.O. Box 5644, Amarillo, TX 79117-5644, USA
  • Telephone: (806) 383-2243
  • Fax: 383-8452

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 August 1926ErectedDiocese of Dallas
Diocese of San Antonio
Diocese of Amarillo (erected)
16 October 1961Territory LostDiocese of Amarillo
Diocese of Austin
Diocese of Dallas-Fort Worth
Diocese of El Paso
Diocese of San Angelo (erected)
25 March 1983Territory LostDiocese of Amarillo
Diocese of San Angelo
Diocese of Lubbock (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
194940,048700,0005.7%3240725564019235ap1951
195872,8001,040,0007.0%6235977503622058ap1960
196680,000777,33910.3%7720978242218090ap1967
1970875,000.0%7373056ap1971
197675,819750,00010.1%6217799591715059ap1977
198089,051812,00011.0%5623791,127332516861ap1981
199031,781385,0008.3%4585359934812633ap1991
199946,356393,82211.8%612637354414835ap2000
200048,783401,26112.2%4935293846313835ap2001
200154,208413,06713.1%486541,00354713835ap2002
200256,361432,19013.0%491059955541114435ap2003
200349,361436,42211.3%43952949541013035ap2004
200443,651432,19010.1%341145970541210635ap2005
200639,609422,4489.4%371148825471210635ap2007
201250,237427,92711.7%371653947571610538ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.6, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 28 Feb 2015