Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend

Dioecesis Wayne Castrensis-South Bendensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Kevin Carl Rhoades, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 28 May 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Indianapolis
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Indiana
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 15,200 (5,792 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: VII (IL, IN, WI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: FTW
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesefwsb.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, P.O. Box 390, 1103 S. Calhoun Street, Fort Wayne, IN 46801
  • Telephone: (260)422-4611
  • Fax: 969-1383

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Fort Wayne
8 January 1857ErectedDiocese of Vincennes Diocese of Fort Wayne (erected)
21 October 1944Territory LostDiocese of Fort Wayne Diocese of Lafayette in Indiana (erected)
10 December 1956Territory LostDiocese of Fort Wayne Diocese of Gary (erected)
Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend
28 May 1960Name ChangedDiocese of Fort Wayne Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Fort Wayne
1950192,2521,031,49618.6%229258487394893,145152ap1951
Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend
1966150,224892,64916.8%1393474863095741,18486ap1967
1970146,605919,69515.9%1192884073605071,02089ap1971
1976151,087973,76415.5%1482273754021643692282ap1977
1980147,438993,00014.8%1092143234561641088789ap1981
1990151,4271,086,04613.9%1071702775463234288990ap1991
1999156,6211,156,12913.5%1011752765673210568287ap2000
2000163,3191,170,33714.0%91911,7942411365687ap2001*
2001166,1081,170,33714.2%881712596412433165687ap2002
2002165,7441,178,52014.1%1101672775982532161787ap2003
2003166,8161,178,52014.2%1091652746082233062287ap2004
2004162,0431,217,93213.3%1041662706001932658184ap2005
2006159,8881,247,85012.8%1011482496421828955884ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 29 May 2013