Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patient Honoré Pierre Yvon Redois, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Natitingou, Benin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1925Born
9 Feb 195024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
10 Feb 196438.7AppointedBishop of Natitingou, Benin
7 May 196438.9Ordained BishopBishop of Natitingou, Benin
11 Nov 198358.4ResignedBishop of Natitingou, Benin
8 Jun 199368.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Natitingou, Benin

MicroData Summary for Patient Honoré Pierre Yvon Redois
Bishop Patient Honoré Pierre Yvon Redois S.M.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Natitingou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Marne, France

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017