Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Resende (Rezende) Costa, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1910BornBorda da Mata
28 Jul 193524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Feb 195342.3AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
24 May 195342.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
19 Jul 195746.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Jul 195746.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Martyropolis
15 Nov 196757.0SucceededArchbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Feb 198675.2RetiredArchbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Jul 200796.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Resende (Rezende) Costa:
Archbishop João Resende (Rezende) Costa S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte

  • a priest for 71.9 years
  • a bishop for 54.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015