Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onofre Cândido Rosa, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1924BornParaguassú
8 Dec 195733.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
9 Jan 197045.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Jan 197045.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Illiberi
19 Mar 197045.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Illiberi
7 Sep 197147.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Dec 197753.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
5 Jul 197853.9SucceededBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
16 Feb 198156.5AppointedBishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
4 Aug 199975.0RetiredBishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
9 Dec 200985.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Onofre Cândido Rosa:
Bishop Onofre Cândido Rosa S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jardim

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013