Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orlando Chaves, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1900BornCampina Verde
10 Jul 192727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Feb 194848.0AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
27 May 194848.3Ordained BishopBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
18 Dec 195656.8AppointedArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
15 Aug 198181.5DiedArchbishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Orlando Chaves:
Archbishop Orlando Chaves S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cuiabá

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013