Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Belchior Joaquim da Silva Neto, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luz, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1918BornAraújos
8 Dec 194527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
13 Feb 196041.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aterrado, Brazil
13 Feb 196041.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cremna
24 Apr 196041.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cremna
9 Jul 196748.6SucceededBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 May 199475.5RetiredBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 May 200081.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Belchior Joaquim da Silva Neto:
Bishop Belchior Joaquim da Silva Neto C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luz

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 31
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 27 Mar 2015