Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ilhéus

Dioecesis Ilheosensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mauro Montagnoli, C.S.S., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 20 October 1913
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Bahia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 10,966 (4,235 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste 3
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Dom Valfredo Tepe 21, 45653-230 Ilheus, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (073)3231-3368

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
20 October 1913ErectedArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) (erected)
Diocese of Caetité (erected)
Diocese of Ilhéus (erected)
21 July 1962Territory LostDiocese of Ilhéus Diocese of Caravelas (erected)
7 November 1978Territory LostDiocese of Ilhéus Diocese of Itabuna (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950644,800650,00099.2%2092922,23493737ap1951
1963760,000800,00095.0%17163323,030165029ap1967
19681,000,000.0%17193601911224ap1971
1976830,000940,00088.3%20244418,8632513638ap1977
1980440,000467,66894.1%1071725,88288518ap1981
1990555,000603,00092.0%2162720,55567726ap1991
1999650,000900,00072.2%4434713,82934838ap2000
2000700,000900,00077.8%4344714,89366238ap2001
2001450,000682,81465.9%504548,33346038ap2002
2002483,305690,43670.0%515568,63066638ap2003
2003487,794690,43670.7%507578,55796838ap2004
2004493,179690,43671.4%507578,65296538ap2005
2006493,179690,43671.4%497568,806125139ap2007
2013528,000734,00071.9%485539,96254341ap2014
2016540,400752,00071.9%4935210,392433740ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.6, 14 Jan 2019; Data: 17 Feb 2019

Quantcast