Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Campelo de Aragão, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Petrolina, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1904BornGaranhuns
5 Jul 193631.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Jun 195045.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuiabá, Mato Grosso, Brazil
15 Jun 195045.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sesta
13 Aug 195045.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sesta
18 Dec 195652.2AppointedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
6 Feb 197570.3ResignedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
10 Sep 198883.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Campelo de Aragão:
Bishop Antônio Campelo de Aragão S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Petrolina

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015