Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Brandão de Castro, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Propriá, Sergipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1919BornRio Espera
2 Feb 193919.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
6 Jan 194424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Jun 196041.1AppointedBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
21 Sep 196041.3Ordained BishopBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
30 Oct 198768.4ResignedBishop of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil
23 Dec 199980.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Propriá, Sergipe, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Brandão de Castro:
Bishop José Brandão de Castro C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Propriá

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 95
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013