Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Giovanni Mol Guimarães

Auxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Galtelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1960 Born
16 Jul 198828.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
199231.9IncardinatedPriest of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Feb 200646.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Feb 200646.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Galtelli
25 Mar 200646.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Galtelli

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Giovanni Mol Guimarães
Bishop Joaquim Giovanni Mol Guimarães (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte

EventPlace
Birth PlacePonte Nova
Ordained BishopGinásio de Mineirinho, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2006
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,097

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast