Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel d’Aversa, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Humaitá, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1915BornCercemaggiore, Italy
8 Dec 194530.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 May 196246.9AppointedPrelate of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
21 May 196246.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Macri
5 Aug 196247.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macri
26 May 197863.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Macri
4 Dec 197964.5AppointedBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
6 Mar 199175.7RetiredBishop of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
20 Mar 200488.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Miguel d’Aversa:
Bishop Miguel d’Aversa S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Humaitá

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 117
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013