Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Carlos Mesquita

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1923Born
8 Dec 194724.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 197450.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Apr 197450.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamada
29 Jun 197450.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamada
6 Mar 197753.3SucceededBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil
16 Dec 198360.1AppointedBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Jun 199672.7ResignedBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Dec 200582.1DiedBishop Emeritus of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Carlos Mesquita
Bishop Antônio Carlos Mesquita (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São João del Rei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItapecerica
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Apostle, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast