Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Taveira Corrêa

Archbishop of Belém do Pará


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1950 BornNova Lima
15 Aug 197323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Apr 199140.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
24 Apr 199140.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinnipsa
6 Jul 199141.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinnipsa
27 Mar 199645.8AppointedArchbishop of Palmas, Tocatins, Brazil
30 Dec 200959.6AppointedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
25 Mar 201059.8InstalledArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alberto Taveira Corrêa:
Archbishop Alberto Taveira Corrêa (born ) Archbishop of Belém do Pará

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Belém do Pará.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,641

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014