Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Prasko

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1914BornZbaraz, Ukraine
2 Apr 193924.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 195844.0AppointedApostolic Exarch of Australia (Ukrainian)
10 May 195844.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Zygris
19 Oct 195844.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zygris
24 Jun 198268.1AppointedBishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia
16 Dec 199278.6RetiredBishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia
28 Jan 200186.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia

MicroData Summary for Ivan Prasko:
Bishop Ivan Prasko (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013