Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Toronto (Ukrainian)

Eparchia Torontina Ucrainorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bryan Joseph Bayda, C.SS.R., Bishop
  • Stephen Victor Chmilar, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Exarchate of Eastern Canada (Ukrainian)
19 January 1948ErectedApostolic Exarchate of Canada (Ukrainian) (Ontario, Quebec, New Brunswick, Nova Scotia, Prince Edward Island, and Newfoundland and Labrador) Apostolic Exarchate of Eastern Canada (Ukrainian) (erected)
Apostolic Exarchate of Toronto (Ukrainian)
10 March 1951Name ChangedApostolic Exarchate of Eastern Canada (Ukrainian) Apostolic Exarchate of Toronto (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Toronto (Ukrainian)
3 November 1956ElevatedApostolic Exarchate of Toronto (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Toronto (Ukrainian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Apostolic Exarchate of Eastern Canada (Ukrainian)
195056,000441963888444040ap1951
Apostolic Exarchate of Toronto (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Toronto (Ukrainian)
196670,00013,293,000.5%7335108648487566ap1967
196855,0006032925971697556ap1971
197683,2006922919146424070ap1977
198083,20072189092411293174ap1981
199083,00075179290218294275ap1991
199983,200851510083220173677ap2000
200041,010881510339821173678ap2001
200141,010851510041020173678ap2002
200241,01080159543117163678ap2003
200341,01081159642717163678ap2004
200436,91081159638419153675ap2005
200936,91081159638418163568ap2010
201036,91084159937219163565ap2011
201424,200896952541861856ap2015
201723,70062623822011857ap2018
202022,900712733131821653ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Apostolic Exarchate of Eastern Canada (Ukrainian)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 40, Page 287, to Page 290
  • Eparchy of Toronto (Ukrainian)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 49, Page 262, to Page 264
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
    Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 19 Jun 2023