Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Daniel Giorgi

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Titular Bishop of Summa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1959 BornBuenos Aires
17 Nov 199031.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
14 Feb 201455.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
14 Feb 201455.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Summa
3 May 201455.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summa

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Daniel Giorgi:
Bishop Alejandro Daniel Giorgi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Mar 2014
  • c3+: CB, 9 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014