Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Ares

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Titular Bishop of Cercina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1963 BornBuenos Aires
25 Nov 198925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
17 Nov 201450.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
17 Nov 201450.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cercina
26 Dec 201451.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cercina

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Ares
Bishop Juan Carlos Ares (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,334
  • c1: CB, 16 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016