Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Baliña

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Titular Bishop of Theudalis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1959 BornBuenos Aires
25 Nov 198930.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
16 Jan 201556.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
16 Jan 201556.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Theudalis
28 Feb 201556.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theudalis

MicroData Summary for José María Baliña:
Bishop José María Baliña (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2015
  • c1: CB, 16 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Jan 2015
  • c34: CB, 20 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015