Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Damián Medina

Auxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Nepte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1967 Born
26 Nov 199427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
26 Nov 201952.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
26 Nov 201952.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepte
29 Feb 202052.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepte

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Damián Medina
Bishop Ignacio Damián Medina (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTandil, Diocese of Azul
Ordained BishopNostra Señora de la Paz, Cathedral, Lomas de Zamora, Diocese of Lomas de Zamora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lomas de Zamora.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2019
  • c1: CB, 26 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 13 Dec 2019
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast