Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Rodríguez-Melgarejo

Bishop Emeritus of San Martín, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1943 Born
23 May 197027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
25 Jun 199451.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
25 Jun 199451.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ucres
27 Sep 199451.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ucres
30 May 200360.0AppointedBishop of San Martín, Argentina
9 Aug 200360.2InstalledBishop of San Martín, Argentina
15 Jun 201875.0RetiredBishop of San Martín, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Rodríguez-Melgarejo
Bishop Guillermo Rodríguez-Melgarejo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Martín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Martín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,368
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 15 Jun 2018

Quantcast