Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Pablo Benna

Auxiliary Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Vardimissa

Apostolic Administrator of Alto Valle del Río Negro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1959 Born
14 Nov 198728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
28 Nov 201758.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
28 Nov 201758.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
23 Dec 201758.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
19 Mar 202161.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Pablo Benna
Bishop Alejandro Pablo Benna (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Comodoro Rivadavia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2017
  • c1: CB, 28 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 Dec 2017
  • c2+: CB, 22 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,622
  • aadm: CB, 19 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Mar 2021

Quantcast