Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario José Serra

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

Titular Bishop of Mentesa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1926BornBuenos Aires
4 Dec 194923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
28 May 197549.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
28 May 197549.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mentesa
8 Aug 197549.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mentesa
8 Feb 200275.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
9 Jul 200579.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mario José Serra:
Bishop Mario José Serra (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 25 Feb 2014