Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Guido Ravinale

Bishop Emeritus of Asti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1943 Born
25 Jun 196724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Biella, Italy
21 Feb 200056.8AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
25 Mar 200056.9Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
2 Apr 200056.9InstalledBishop of Asti, Italy
24 Sep 201572.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alba (Pompea), Italy
21 Jan 201672.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Alba (Pompea), Italy
16 Aug 201875.3RetiredBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Guido Ravinale
Bishop Francesco Guido Ravinale (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Asti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella, Diocese of Biella
Ordained BishopSantuario di Nostra Signora di Oropa, Oropa, Diocese of Biella

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Asti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,728
  • ab: CB, 24 Sep 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast