Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriele Mana

Bishop Emeritus of Biella, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1943 Born
25 Jun 196724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
13 Jul 200158.3AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
1 Sep 200158.4Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
7 Oct 200158.5InstalledBishop of Biella, Italy
27 Jul 201875.3RetiredBishop of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Mana
Bishop Gabriele Mana (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Biella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarene, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained PriestTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni Battista, Cathedral, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Biella.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,033
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2018
  • c1/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 30 Sep 2018

Quantcast