Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Natalino Pescarolo

Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1929 BornPalestro
29 Jun 195223.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 199061.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuneo, Italy
7 Apr 199061.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Alexanum
5 May 199061.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alexanum
4 May 199263.1AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
1 Feb 199969.8AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
24 Aug 200576.4RetiredBishop of Fossano, Italy
24 Aug 200576.4RetiredBishop of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Natalino Pescarolo:
Bishop Natalino Pescarolo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuneo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cuneo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Aug 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013