Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Anfossi

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1935 Born
28 Jun 195924.3Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
30 Dec 199459.8AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
22 Jan 199559.8Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
19 Feb 199559.9InstalledBishop of Aosta, Italy
9 Nov 201176.6RetiredBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Anfossi (VIAF: 233478001)
Bishop Giuseppe Anfossi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarebbe-Enneberg, Diocese of Brixen {Bressanone}
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni Battista, Cathedral Basilica, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni Battista, Cathedral Basilica, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aosta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,482
  • c1/loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast