Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piero Delbosco

Bishop of Cuneo, Italy

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1955 Born
11 Nov 197924.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Torino {Turin}, Italy
15 Nov 198025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
9 Oct 201560.1AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
9 Oct 201560.1AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
29 Nov 201560.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
6 Dec 201560.3InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Piero Delbosco
Bishop Piero Delbosco (born ) Bishop of Cuneo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoirino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cuneo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2015
  • c1/od: CB, 12 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,677

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast