Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Brunetti

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1962 Born
7 Jun 198724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Jan 201653.5AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
13 Mar 201653.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Brunetti
Bishop Marco Brunetti (born ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni Battista, Cathedral Basilica, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Death PlaceCathedral, Alba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alba (Pompea).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 26 Jan 2016
  • c3+: CB, 5 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,861
  • c1/loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast