Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alceste Catella

Bishop Emeritus of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1942 Born
26 Jun 196624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Biella, Italy
15 May 200866.0AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
29 Jun 200866.1Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
7 Sep 200866.3InstalledBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
31 Jul 201775.2RetiredBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alceste Catella (VIAF: 6590249)
Bishop Alceste Catella (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTavigliano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Casale Monferrato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2008
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,771
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jul 2017