Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislav Nemet, S.V.D.

Bishop of Zrenjanin, Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1956 Born
8 Sep 198226.0ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
1 May 198326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
23 Apr 200851.6AppointedBishop of Zrenjanin, Serbia
5 Jul 200851.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zrenjanin, Serbia

MicroData Summary for Ladislav Nemet
Bishop Ladislav Nemet S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Zrenjanin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOdžaci

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zrenjanin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,777

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast