Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Płoski

Deceased

Bishop of Poland, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1956Born
6 Jun 198226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
16 Oct 200448.6AppointedBishop of Poland, Military
30 Oct 200448.6Ordained BishopBishop of Poland, Military
10 Apr 201054.0DiedBishop of Poland, Military

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Płoski
Bishop Tadeusz Płoski (born , died ) Bishop of Poland, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLidzbark Warminski

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,708
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018