Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marian Przykucki

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1924Born
19 Feb 195026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
12 Dec 197349.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
12 Dec 197349.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Glenndálocha
3 Feb 197450.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Glenndálocha
15 Jun 198157.3AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
25 Mar 199268.1AppointedArchbishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
1 May 199975.2RetiredArchbishop of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland
16 Oct 200985.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marian Przykucki (VIAF: 13749695)
Archbishop Marian Przykucki (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Szczecin-Kamień

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSkoki

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast