Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Jósef Kowalski

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1896BornGniezno
8 Oct 192226.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 194650.0AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
4 Aug 194650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
6 May 197276.2DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Jósef Kowalski:
Bishop Kazimierz Jósef Kowalski (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013