Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Antonio Eguren Anselmi, S.C.V.

Archbishop of Piura, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1956 Born
9 Jul 198125.0ProfessedMember of Sodalicio de Vida Cristiana
12 Dec 198226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
Feb 200144.6IncardinatedPriest of Sodalicio de Vida Cristiana
16 Feb 200245.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
16 Feb 200245.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Ripae
7 Apr 200245.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Ripae
11 Jul 200650.0AppointedArchbishop of Piura, Peru
22 Aug 200650.1InstalledArchbishop of Piura, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Eguren Anselmi
Archbishop José Antonio Eguren Anselmi S.C.V. (born ) Archbishop of Piura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Piura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast