Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidro Barrio Barrio

Bishop of Huancavélica, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1943 Born
6 Jul 196825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Burgos, Spain
10 Apr 200258.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Huancavélica, Peru
25 May 200259.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Huancavélica, Peru
18 Jun 200562.1SucceededBishop of Huancavélica, Peru

MicroData Summary for Isidro Barrio Barrio
Bishop Isidro Barrio Barrio (born ) Bishop of Huancavélica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillafranca Montes de Oca, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huancavélica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast