Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kay Martin Schmalhausen Panizo

Prelate Emeritus of Ayaviri, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1964 Born
14 Dec 198925.3ProfessedMember of Sodalicio de Vida Cristiana
16 Dec 198925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sodalicio de Vida Cristiana
18 Feb 200641.5AppointedPrelate of Ayaviri, Peru
23 Apr 200641.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Ayaviri, Peru
7 Apr 202156.6ResignedPrelate of Ayaviri, Peru

MicroData Summary for Kay Martin Schmalhausen Panizo
Bishop Kay Martin Schmalhausen Panizo (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Ayaviri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Ayaviri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,141
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast