Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Eduardo Vera Colona

Bishop of Ica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1962 BornChiclayo
8 Dec 198725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chiclayo, Peru
31 Oct 200745.7AppointedBishop of Ica, Peru
8 Dec 200745.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ica, Peru

MicroData Summary for Héctor Eduardo Vera Colona:
Bishop Héctor Eduardo Vera Colona (born ) Bishop of Ica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,576

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013